In this page we have *NCERT Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 1: Knowing our Numbers Exercise 1.1,1.2,1.3 with try these also*. Hope you like them and do not forget to like , social share
and comment at the end of the page.

Fill in the blanks:

(a). 1 lakh = _________ ten thousand.

(b). 1 million = _________ hundred thousand.

(c). 1 crore = _________ ten lakhs.

(d). 1 crore = _________ million.

(e). 1 million = _________ lakh.

a) 1 lakh = _10___ ten thousand

1 lakh = 1,00,000

= 100 thousand

= 10 ten thousand

(b). 1 million = ____10_____ hundred thousand.

1 million = 1,000,000

= 1000 thousand

= 10 hundred thousand

(c). 1 crore = _______10__ ten lakhs.

1 crore = 1,00,00,000

= 100 lakhs

= 10 ten lakh

(d). 1 crore = ______10___ million.

1 crore = 1,00,00,000

Adding commas to the number 10000000 according to the International system, we have

10,000,000 = 10 million

1 crore = 10 million

(e). 1 million = ____10_____ lakh.

1 million = 10,000,000

Adding commas to the number 10000000 according to the Indian system, we have

1,00,00,000 = 1 crore = 100 lakhs

1 million = 100 lakh

Place commas correctly and write the numerals:

(a)Seventy-three lakh seventy-five thousand three hundred seven.

(b)Nine crore five lakhs forty-one.

(c)Seven crore fifty-two lakhs twenty-one thousand three hundred two.

(d)Fifty-eight million four hundred twenty-three thousand two hundred two.

(e)Twenty-three lakh thirty thousand ten.

(a) $73,75,307$

(b) $9,05,00,041$

(c) $7,52,21,302$

(d) $58,423,202$

(e) $23,30,010$

Insert commas suitably and write the names according to Indian System of Numeration:

(a) $87595762$

(b) $8546283$

(c) $99900046$

(d) $98432701$

A |
8,75,95,762 |
Eight crore seventy-five lakh ninety-five thousand seven hundred sixty-two |

B |
85,46,283 |
Eighty-five lakh forty-six thousand two hundred eighty-three |

C |
9,99,00,046 |
Nine crore ninety-nine lakh forty-six |

D |
9,84,32,701 |
Nine crore eighty-four lakh thirty-two thousand seven hundred one |

Insert commas suitably and write the names according to International System of Numeration:

(a) $78921092$

(b) $7452283$

(c) $99985102$

(c) $48049831$

A |
78,921,092 |
Seventy-eight million nine hundred twenty-one thousand ninety-twos |

B |
7,452,283 |
Seven million four hundred fifty-two thousand two hundred eighty-threes |

C |
99,985,102 |
Ninety-nine million nine hundred eighty-five thousand one hundred twos |

D |
48, 049,831 |
Forty-eight million forty-nine thousand eight hundred thirty-ones |

Book exhibition was held for four days in a school. The number of tickets sold at the counter on the first, second, third, and final day was respectively 1094, 1812, 2050, and 2751. Find the total number of tickets sold on all the four days.

Given

Number of tickets sold at the counter on 1st day = 1094

Number of tickets sold at the counter on 2nd day = 1812

Number of tickets sold at the counter on 3rd day = 2050

Number of tickets sold at the counter on 4th day = 2751

Total Number of tickets sold on all the four days = 1094 + 1812 + 2050 + 2751

=7707

Shekhar is a famous cricket player. He has so far scored 6980 runs in test matches. He wishes to complete 10, 000 runs. How many more runs does he need?

Runs scored as of now= 6980

Runs Shekhar wishes to score = 10,000

No of runs required Shekhar need to achieve his wish = Runs Shekhar wants to score - Runs scored so far =10,000 – 6980 =3020

So ,Shekhar need 3,020 more runs to achieve his target

In an election, the successful candidate registered 5, 77, 500 votes and his nearest rival secured 3, 48, 700 votes. By what margin did the successful candidate win the election?

Votes registered by successful candidate = 5,77,500

Votes registered by rival = 3,48,700

Margin will be given by = 5,77,500 − 3,48,700

=228800

So, Margin = 2,28,800

Kirti book store sold books worth Rs 2,85,891 in the first week of June and books worth Rs 4,00,768 in the second week of the month. How much was the sale for the two weeks together? In which week was the sale greater and by how much?

Value of Books sold in 1st week of June = Rs 2,85,891

Value of books sold in 2nd week of June = Rs 4,00,768

Total sale of books of two weeks = Sale in 1st week + Sale in 2nd week = 2,85,891 + 4,00,768

=6,86,659

The sale for the two weeks together was 6,86,659.

Since 4,00,768 > 2,85,891, sale in 2nd week was greater than 1st week.

Now difference would be

=4,00,768 - 2,85,891 = 1,14,877

The sale in 2nd week was larger than the sale in 1st week by Rs 1,14,877.

Find the difference between the greatest and the least number that can be written using the digits 6, 2, 7, 4, 3 each only once.

The digits to be used are 6,2,7,4,3

The greatest number can be obtained by writing the digits from the largest to smallest i.e., 7 6 4 2 3

Greatest number will be= 76432

The least number is obtained by writing the digits from smallest to largest i.e., 2 3 4 6 7

Smallest number will be= 23467

Difference = 76432 − 23467

=52,965

Therefore,the difference between the greatest and the least number using the nunber given above is 52,965.

A machine, on an average, manufactures 2,825 screws a day. How many screws did it produce in the month of January 2006?

Given Screws produced the machine in one day = 2,825

Now we know that Days in the month of January = 31

Screws produced in Jan 2006(31 days )= $2825 \times 31 = 87575$

A merchant had Rs 78,592 with her. She placed an order for purchasing 40 radio sets at Rs 1200 each. How much money will remain with her after the purchase?

One radio set cost= Rs 1200

40 radio sets will cost= $1200 \times 40 $= Rs 48000

Money with Merchant = Rs 78,592

Money spent for purchasing 40 radio sets = Rs 48,000

Money left = (Money with Merchant) – (Money spent on radio sets)

=78592 − 48000 =30592

A student multiplied 7236 by 65 instead of multiplying by 56. By how much was his answer greater than the correct answer? (Hint: Do you need to do both the multiplications?)

Difference between 65 and 56 = 9

Difference in the answer = 7236 × 9

=65124

We can double check using 7236 × 65 = 4,70,340 and 7236 × 56 = 4,05,216.

Difference is =4,70,340 - 4,05,216

=65,124

Therefore, the answer was greater than the correct answer by 65,124

To stitch a shirt, 2m 15 cm cloth is needed. Out of 40 m cloth, how many shirts can be stitched and how much cloth will remain? (Hint: convert data in cm.)

First convert both the data given into same units

As 1 m = 100 cm

Cloth needed to stitch one shirt=2 m 15 cm = 215 cm

Total cloth present=40 m = $40 \times 100$ = 4000 cm

Total Number of shirts that can be stitched out of 4000 cm = 4000 ÷ 215

So, 18 shirts can be made. Remainder will be 130 cm, i.e. 1 m 30 cm, cloth will remain.

Medicine is packed in boxes, each weighing 4 kg 500 g. How many such boxes can be loaded in a van which cannot carry beyond 800 kg?

First convert into same unit As 1 kg = 1000 g

So ,Weight of one box=4 kg 500 g = 4500 g

Also Total capacity of the VAN= 800 kg = $800 \times 1000$ = 800000 g

Number of Medicine boxes that can be loaded in the van = 800000 ÷ 4500

So ,it can be observed that 177 boxes at maximum can be loaded in the van.

The distance between the school and the house of a student’s house is 1 km 875 m. Every day she walks both ways. Find the total distance covered by her in six days.

Distance between the school and the house = 1 km 875 m

Now, 1 km = 1000 m

1 km 875 m = 1875 m

Distance travelled each day =2 × distance between school and house= 1875 × 2 = 3750 m

Distance travelled in 6 days = 3750 × 6 =22500 m

= 22.5 km or 22 km 500 m

A vessel has 4 liters and 500 ml of curd. In how many glasses, each of 25 ml capacity, can it be filled?

Converting into same units (1 L = 1000 ml)

Capacity of vessel = 4 L 500 ml = 4500 ml

Capacity of one glass = 25 ml

Number of glasses that can be filled with curd = 4500 ÷ 25

So, 180 glasses can be filled.

Estimate each of the following using general rule:

(a) $730 + 998$

(b) $796 - 314$

(c) $12, 904 + 2, 888$

(d) $28, 292 - 21, 496$

Make ten more such examples of addition, subtraction and estimation of their outcome.

(a) $730 + 998$

Rounding off to nearest hundreds we get 730 rounds off to 700 and 998 rounds off to 1000.

$=700 + 1000=1700$

(b) $796 - 314$

Rounding off to nearest hundreds, we get 796 rounds off to 800 and 314 rounds off to 300.

$=800-300=500$

(c) $12904 + 2822$

Rounding off to nearest thousands, we get 12904 rounds off to 13000 and 2822 rounds off to 3000.

$=13000+ 3000=16000$

(d) $28,296 - 21,496$

Rounding off to nearest thousands, we get 28296 rounds off to 28000 and 21496 rounds off to 21000.

$=28000-21000=7000$

Give a rough estimate (by rounding off to nearest hundreds) and also a closer estimate (by rounding off to nearest tens):

(a) $439 + 334 + 4, 317$

(b) $1,08, 734 - 47, 599$

(c) $8325 - 491$

(d) $4, 89, 348 - 48, 365$

Make four more such examples.

(a) $439 + 334 + 4317$

Rounding off to nearest hundreds, 439, 334, and 4317 may be rounded off to 400, 300, and 4300 respectively.

So sum would be $=400+300+4300=5000$

Rounding off to nearest tens, 439, 334, and 4317 may be rounded off to 440, 330, and 4320 respectively.

So sum would be =440+330+4320=5090

(b) 1,08,734 − 47,599

Rounding off to hundreds, 1,08,734 and 47,599 may be rounded off to 1,08,700 and 47,600 respectively.

So difference would be= 108700-47600=61100

Rounding off to tens, 1,08,734 and 47,599 may be rounded off to 1,08,730 and 47,600 respectively.

So difference would be=108730-47600=61130

(c) $8325 - 491$

Rounding off to hundreds, 8325 and 491 may be rounded off to 8300 and 500 respectively.

Difference would be =8300-500=7800

Rounding off to tens, 8325 and 491 may be rounded off to 8330 and 490 respectively.

Difference would be=8330-490=7840

(d) 4,89,348 − 48,365

Rounding off to hundreds, 489348 and 48365 may be rounded off to 489300 and 48400 respectively.

Difference would be=489300-48400=440900

Rounding off to tens, 489348 and 48365 may be rounded off to 489350 and 48370 respectively.

Difference would be= 489350-48370=440980

Estimate the following products using general rule:

(a) $578 \times 161$

(b) $5281 \times 3491$

(c) $1291 \times 592$

(d) $9250 \times 29$

(a) $578 \times 161$

Rounding off by general rule, 598 and 161 may be rounded off to 600 and 200 respectively.

$600 \times 200=120000$

(b) $5281 \times 3491$

Rounding off by general rule, 5281 and 3491 may be rounded off to 5000 and 3000 respectively.

$5000 \times 3000= 15000000$

(c) $1291 \times 592$

Rounding off by general rule, 1291 and 592 may be rounded off to 1000 and 600 respectively.

$1000 \times 600=600000$

(d) $9250 \times 29$

Rounding off by general rule, 9250 and 29 may be rounded off to 9000 and 30 respectively.

$9000 \times 30=270000$

Can you instantly find the greatest and the smallest numbers in each row?

1. 382, 4972, 18, 59785, 750.

Ans. 59785 is the greatest and 18 is the smallest.

2. 1473, 89423, 100, 5000, 310.

Ans. 89423 is the greatest and 100 is the smallest.

3. 1834, 75284, 111, 2333, 450 .

Ans. 75284 is the greatest and 111 is the smallest.

4. 2853, 7691, 9999, 12002, 124

Ans. 12002 is the greatest and 124 is the smallest.

Yes it was easy

The greatest number has the most thousands and the smallest is only in hundreds or in tens.

Question 2

Find the greatest and the smallest numbers.

(a) 4536, 4892, 4370, 4452.

(b) 15623, 15073, 15189, 15800.

(c) 25286, 25245, 25270, 25210.

(d) 6895, 23787, 24569, 24659

Answer

a. 4892 is the greatest and 4370 is the smallest.

b. 15800 is the greatest and 15073 is the smallest.

c. 25286 is the greatest and 25210 is the smallest.

d. 24659 is the greatest and 6895 is the smallest.

Question 3. Use the given digits without repetition and make the greatest and smallest 4-digit numbers.

(a) 2, 8, 7, 4

(b) 9, 7, 4, 1

(c) 4, 7, 5, 0

(d) 1, 7, 6, 2

(e) 5, 4, 0, 3

(Hint : 0754 is a 3-digit number.)

Answer

For greatest, we need to arranges digit in decreasing order and for smallest, in increasing order

a. Greatest:8742 ,Smallest:2478

b. Greatest:9741 ,Smallest:1479

c. Greatest:7540 ,Smallest:4057

d. Greatest:7621 ,Smallest:1267

e. Greatest:5430 ,Smallest:3045

Question 4.

Now make the greatest and the smallest 4-digit numbers by using any one digit twice.

(a) 3, 8, 7

(b) 9, 0, 5

(c) 0, 4, 9

(d) 8, 5, 1

(Hint : Think in each case which digit will you use twice.)

Answer

Here for greatest, largest digit will be used twice, and for smallest, smallest digit will be used twice

a. Greatest:8873 ,Smallest:3378

b. Greatest:9950 ,Smallest:5009

c. Greatest:9940 ,Smallest:4009

d. Greatest:8851 ,Smallest:1158

Question 5.

Make the greatest and the smallest 4-digit numbers using any four different digits with conditions as given.

(a) Digit 7 is always at ones place

Greatest: 9867

Smallest:1027

(b) Digit 4 is always at tens place

Greatest:___

Smallest: ___

(c) Digit 9 is always at hundreds place

Greatest:____

Smallest:____

(d) Digit 1 is always at thousands place

Greatest:____

Smallest:____

Answer:

b.

Greatest:9847

Smallest: 1042

c.

Greatest:8976

Smallest:1902

d.

Greatest:1987

Smallest:1023

Question 6. Take two digits, say 2 and 3. Make 4-digit numbers using both the digits equal number of times.

Which is the greatest number?

Which is the smallest number?

How many different numbers can you make in all?

Answer

Greatest: 3322

Smallest :2233

Total number : 6

Question 7

How many milligrams make one kilogram?

Answer

1 kg=1000000 mg

Question 8.

A box contains 2,00,000 medicine tablets each weighing 20 mg. What is the total weight of all the tablets in the box in grams and in kilograms?

Answer

Total Weight = 200000 * 20 = 4000000 mg = 4 kg

Question 8

A bus started its journey and reached different places with a speed of 60 km/hour. The journey is shown below.

(i) Find the total distance covered by the bus from A to D.

(ii) Find the total distance covered by the bus from D to G.

(iii) Find the total distance covered by the bus, if it starts from A and returns back to A.

(iv) Can you find the difference of distances from C to D and D to E?

(v)Find out the time taken by the bus to reach

(a) A to B (b) C to D

(c) E to G (d) Total journey

Answer

i. Total distance covered by the bus from A to D = 4170 + 3410 + 2160 = 9740 km

ii. total distance covered by the bus from D to G=8140+4830 +2550=15,520 km

iii. total distance covered by the bus, if it starts from A and returns back to A

= Total distance covered by the bus from A to D + total distance covered by the bus from D to G + distance covered from G to A

= 9740+15,520 +1290=26550 km

iv. As seen from the figure,distance from C to D=2160 km

Distance from D to E = 8140 km

v. Now it is given bus speed is 60 km/hr which means it covers 60 km in 1 hr.

a. Distance from A to B=4170 km

So time taken = $4170 \div 60$ = 69 hour 30 min

b. Distance from C to D=2160 km

So time taken = $2160 \div 60$ = 36 hour

c. Total distance covered from E to G = 4830 + 2550=7380 km

So time taken = $7380 \div 60$ = 123 hour

d. Now Total journey distance= 26550 km

So time taken = $26550 \div 60$ = 442 hour 30 min

Question 9

a. Can you find the total weight of apples and oranges Raman sold last year?

Weight of apples = __________ kg

Weight of oranges = _________ kg

Therefore, total weight = _____ kg + _____ kg = _____ kg

(b) Can you find the total money Raman got by selling apples?

(c) Can you find the total money Raman got by selling apples and oranges together?

(d) Make a table showing how much money Raman received from selling each item. Arrange the entries of amount of money received in descending order. Find the item which brought him the highest amount.How much is this amount?

Answer

a.

Weight of apples = 2457 kg

Weight of oranges = 3004 kg

Answer – The total weight of oranges and apples = 5461 kg.

b. Apple cost is Rs 40 per kg

Total apple sold =2457 kg

Money made= 40 * 2457= Rs 98280

c. Orange cost is Rs 30 per kg

Total oranges sold= 3004 kg

Money made= 30 * 3004 = 90120

Total money Raman got by selling Apple and Oranges = 98280 + 90120=Rs 188,440

d.

Here is the table which shows money Raman received from selling each item

Descending order

253670 , 240012,160040,98280,90120,68280,38530

Item which brought the highest amount is tooth brush and amount is Rs 253670

Download this assignment as pdf

**Notes****Assignments**-
**NCERT Solutions**

Practicing make students fluent in their concept. Help your child practice math using our **Class 6 Maths worksheets (Kindle Edition)**

You can use this ebook on PC, tablet, mobile devices by using Free Kindle Reading Apps for android and ios.

** Given below are the links of some of the reference books for class 6 science and class 6 math. **

- Science Foundation Course For JEE/NEET/NSO/Olympiad - Class 6
- Science for Class 6
- Mathematics Foundation Course For JEE/IMO/Olympiad - Class 6
- Mathematics for class 6 by R S Aggarwal

You can use above books for extra knowledge and practicing different questions.

Class 6 Maths Class 6 Science

Thanks for visiting our website.

**DISCLOSURE:** THIS PAGE MAY CONTAIN AFFILIATE LINKS, MEANING I GET A COMMISSION IF YOU DECIDE TO MAKE A PURCHASE THROUGH MY LINKS, AT NO COST TO YOU. PLEASE READ MY **DISCLOSURE**Â FOR MORE INFO.